THE CAESAR JARVIS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide for the public benefit housing and other associated amenities in London and the Reading area for persons in necessitous circumstances, upon terms appropriate to their means and for aged persons or those in need through sickness or disabilities.The Charity will own and rent out housing. To advance any other exclusively charitable purpose according to the law in England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Wokingham
Governance
- 02 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WINIFRED ANNE BLAY | Chair | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELLEN STRUTHERS | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE MACFARLANE STRUTHERS | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNY MARLEY | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £536 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS, AND FOR AGED PERSONS OR FOR THOSE IN NEED THROUGH SICKNESS, HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES INCLUDING HOUSING DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; (2) TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE (ACCORDING TO THE LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, WHICH THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bridgeside Cottage
Church Lane
NESTON
CH64 9UT
- Phone:
- 01513367702
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window