AGD European Youth Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Activities Training Courses National and international conferences, panels, symposiums, competitions, youth festivals, memorial days, multi-purpose indoor hall meetings, seminars Help the victims of fire, earthquake, flood and similar natural disasters and to form rescue groups Organising ceremonies or programs, events to commemorate cultural,religious,historical and other important days
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 17 January 2017: CIO registration
- ICMG BRIGHTON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IBRAHIM DOGRU | Chair | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
OMER ASLAN | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
OKTAY SISMAN Treasurer | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.68k | £13.35k | £13.49k | £15.29k | £18.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.38k | £6.37k | £12.99k | £9.96k | £14.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jan 2017 as amended on 06 Jan 2020 as amended on 07 Jan 2020 as amended on 07 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN THE UK; FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, SEMINARS AND EVENTS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAMIC FAITH; 2) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND/OR POVERTY BY PROVIDING : GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Brambledean Road
Portslade
BRIGHTON
BN41 1LP
- Phone:
- 07958774612
- Email:
- Idogru57@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window