LITTLE PIPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community and diverse preschool,that provides a safe, caring and stimulating setting for all children to learn and develop at their own individual pace. We aim to support the children and their families and ensure our children get the best possible start in early years education as well as providing a cultural community environment with activities and events to support us .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £68,598 from 1 government contract(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 24 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
lisa dawn barber | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.86k | £103.09k | £81.95k | £70.29k | £85.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.36k | £73.70k | £89.60k | £71.19k | £91.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £65.54k | £62.70k | £68.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE AND CARE FOR ALL CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE, PROVIDING SAFE AND STIMULATING ACTIVITIES, TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR FUNDRAISING TO RAISE FUNDS FOR NEW EQUIPMENT OR DAYS OUT FOR THE CHILDREN THAT ATTEND LITTLE PIPS.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 Smyrks Road
LONDON
SE17 2QP
- Phone:
- 07773240778
- Email:
- stlittlepips@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window