SAFE HORIZON UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reduce isolation through peer support. Share information on mental health issues. Raise awareness of psychological injury in policing. Encourage a supportive culture within constabularies. Ensure Officers are aware of their rights and challenge inappropriate working practices. Work with partner agencies to provide wrap around support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86k | £6.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.95k | £7.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 07 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 07 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 13 February 2019 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 17 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF PSYCHOLOGICAL DISTRESS, INJURY OR DISORDER OF (EX) POLICE OFFICERS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PEER SUPPORT ACTIVITIES, ONLINE COMMUNITY, RECOVERY WORKSHOPS, INFORMATION SHARING, SIGN POSTING AND MEMBER INVOLVEMENT OPPORTUNITIES. (2) THE RELIEF OF PSYCHOLOGICAL DISTRESS, INJURY, DISORDER OR ABUSE OF CLOSE FAMILY MEMBERS, NAMELY SPOUSES AND CHILDREN BY REASON OF SECONDARY TRAUMATIC STRESS, COMPASSION FATIGUE AND DOMESTIC ABUSE THROUGH PEER SUPPORT ACTIVITIES, ONLINE COMMUNITY, INFORMATION SHARING AND SIGNPOSTING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window