SAMARITANS OF LEICESTER, LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND

Charity number: 1170691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity provides confidential emotional support to those who are experiencing feelings of distress or despair, including those who may be at risk of suicide, with the aim of improving their emotional health and reducing the incidence of suicide. The Charity operates a telephone helpline which is open 24 hours a day; 365 days a year. Our support allows contacts to explore difficult feelings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £165,032
Total expenditure: £155,560

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicester City
  • Leicestershire
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 May 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • LEICESTER SAMARITANS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Phil Grierson Trustee 02 December 2024
None on record
David Alexander Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
Sandesh Jesrani Trustee 29 June 2023
ALEX'S WISH
Received: On time
Bethan Painter Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
Rajesh Narendra Modha Trustee 08 December 2021
None on record
Sarah Anne Sheard Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
John Richardson Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £185.40k £152.41k £124.39k £127.16k £165.03k
Total expenditure £132.23k £109.39k £137.21k £148.97k £155.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £50.75k £4.79k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 11/03/1965 AS AMENDED ON 21/03/1973 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/1984 AS AMENDED ON 26/03/1993 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2006 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2015 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN LEICESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
LEICESTER AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Registration history
  • 31 May 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Samaritans
1a Elmfield Avenue
LEICESTER
LE2 1RB
Phone:
0116 270 5500