Abington Park Heritage Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the provision of facilities for recreation in Abington Park of individuals and the public at large in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the condition of life of the said inhabitants; and to preserve and protect the historical features in Abington Park.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 27 April 2017: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ABINGTON PARK CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN SHREWSBURY | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW HANMER | Trustee | 17 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £565 | £3.33k | £651 | £1.47k | £1.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.83k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 DEC 2016 as amended on 18 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN ABINGTON PARK OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND 2)TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HISTORICAL FEATURES IN ABINGTON PARK. (3} ABINGTON PARK, NORTHAMPTON “ABINGTON PARK” MEANS THE FREEHOLD OF ABINGTON PARK BEING THE CURRENT HOLDING OF LAND PURCHASED OR GIVEN TO THE CURRENT OWNER NORTHAMPTON BOROUGH COUNCIL BETWEEN 1895 AND 1903 AND COMPRISES THE ROAD FRONTAGES IN A CLOCKWISE DIRECTION OF: UPPER PARK – ARDINGTON ROAD, WELLINGBOROUGH ROAD, PARK AVENUE SOUTH AND CHRISTCHURCH ROAD AND LOWER PARK – PARK AVENUE SOUTH, WELLINGBOROUGH ROAD, THE REAR GARDEN BOUNDARIES OF LARGE HOUSES FRONTING WELLINGBOROUGH ROAD AND ABINGTON PARK CRESCENT.
Area of benefit
ABINGTON PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 GREENWAY
WESTON FAVELL
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 3BW
- Phone:
- 01604405193
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window