THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS, PIMLICO, LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Barnabas Church is a Church of England parish church, providing regular public worship open to all in a beautiful building, and promoting the whole mission of the Church in Pimlico, Westminster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 06 January 2017: Standard registration
- St Barnabas Church Pimlico (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN MICHAEL PEARSON-HICKS | Chair | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Carl Emilien | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Selwyn Richard Stuart Leamy | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Bates | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vera Roskell | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNI HOPKINS | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATE MCCARTHY | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr VICTORIA ROBIN-JANE MUIR | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
KRIS ROMANSKI | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|||||
LINDA ULRICH | Trustee | 25 April 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.00k | £127.48k | £155.30k | £155.37k | £152.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.75k | £118.53k | £134.80k | £125.61k | £133.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £1.26k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.98k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 ORSETT STREET
LONDON
SE11 5PW
- Phone:
- 02078203534
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window