Accounts and annual returns POSITIVE WEST MIDLANDS

Charity Number: 1172171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 October 2023 08 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2023 08 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 October 2022 06 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2022 06 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 October 2021 29 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2021 29 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 October 2020 12 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2020 12 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 October 2019 11 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2019 11 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window