Financial history PACT HOUSE STANLEY

Charity Number: 1172612
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £70.82k £187.15k £240.73k £205.81k £215.63k
Total expenditure £83.07k £129.70k £172.12k £206.87k £253.62k
Income from government contracts N/A £21.00k N/A N/A £54.58k
Income from government grants £7.84k £25.00k £142.55k £70.72k £61.78k