SOUTH STAFFORDSHIRE MEDICAL CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST - THE ROTHA ABRAHAM BEQUEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to members of the medical profession in the Wolverhampton area to help them to improve the quality of medical care for the inhabitants of Wolverhampton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 13 November 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE MARIE MONNES-THOMAS | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|||||
John Murphy | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
RONALD JOHN CULLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.37k | £22.86k | £17.45k | £14.60k | £19.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.77k | £51.93k | £4.09k | £14.86k | £4.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 382 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 February 2025 | 747 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 284 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 1979
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE FROM THE MEDICAL CENTRE THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF SCIENCE AND MEDICINE AND ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE PROGRESS AND DEVELOPMENT OF ALL BRANCHES OF MEDICINE AND SURGERY AND IN PARTICULAR TO FOUND, AID, MAINTAIN AND ENDOW SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES TO ENABLE MEMBERS OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION IN WOLVERHAMPTON TO CONTACT MEMBERS OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION IN OTHER LANDS AND TO TRAVEL FOR THE PURPOSE OF LEARNING NEW TECHNIQUES AND NEW METHODS OF MANAGEMENT OF DISEASES IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF MEDICAL CARE FOR THE INGABITANTS OF WOLVERHAMPTON.
Area of benefit
WOLVERHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
F B C Manby Bowdler
6-10 George Street
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV2 4DN
- Phone:
- 01902392484
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window