The Ilham foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has explored possible areas of future activity and accessing areas of interest. We have completed the formalities of the names change. Further funding and initial grants are expected in the next year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 November 2017: Standard registration
- THE ABC FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NA'IMAH BINTI ABDUL KHALID | Chair | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Francis Donald Ventura | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
philip marriott | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED AMIN ZAINUDDIN BIN DAIM | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED AMIR ZAINUDDIN BIN DAIM | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £250.00k | £260 | |
|
Total expenditure | £313 | £223 | £297 | £6.91k | £203.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 190 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 JUN 2017 as amended on 17 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ALL PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UHY Hacker Young Llp
4 Thomas More Square
LONDON
E1W 1YW
- Phone:
- 07377511257
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window