Accounts and annual returns TRAVEL TEACHER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1171341
Charity reporting is overdue by 1350 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 254 days
Accounts and TAR 29 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 254 days
Annual return 29 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 620 days
Accounts and TAR 29 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 620 days
Annual return 29 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 985 days
Accounts and TAR 29 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 985 days
Annual return 29 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1350 days
Accounts and TAR 29 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1350 days
Annual return 29 October 2019 02 September 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 October 2019 02 September 2020 4 days late Download Open in new window