Financial history SESSAY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1171804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £197.67k £49.83k
Total expenditure £1.15k £1.15k £1.00k £22.29k £25.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £6.92k £18.36k