SPIKE PRINT STUDIO LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spike Print Studio in Bristol is a the largest open-access print studio in the South West advancing printmaking education for all. We provide affordable studio facilities and a creative environment with technical support. Our respected and rich learning programme provides training in contemporary and traditional printmaking with a mixed programme of courses, workshops and master classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 08 November 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dione Chambers | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Hinshelwood | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Stibbon | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
susie brooks | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Spradbery | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Anne Hamilton | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
anna harley | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.97k | £133.94k | £213.14k | £180.85k | £201.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.16k | £126.94k | £208.97k | £217.68k | £189.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.34k | £56.93k | £496 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 FEB 1977 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 OCT 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 MAY 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 OCT 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF PRINTMAKING AND THROUGH PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THIS ART.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spike Print Studio
133 Cumberland Road
BRISTOL
BS1 6UX
- Phone:
- 07765427437
- Email:
- info@spikeprintstudio.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window