THE LENOX PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lenox Project intends to build and launch a full-size replica of the Lenox, a third-rate warship that was built in 1678 in Deptford and was the first of Charles II?s thirty ships. We also want to establish a centre of excellence for historic ship-building, and a museum of Deptford history for the many archives that are kept at the National Maritime Museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 January 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lewisham
Governance
- 23 January 2017: Standard registration
- 15 April 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1077522 THE PIONEER SAILING TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/01/2020 | 22/01/2021 | 22/01/2022 | 22/01/2023 | 22/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.56k | £210 | £1.16k | £407 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.07k | £1.31k | £754 | £754 | £1.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 January 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 January 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 January 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SHIP BUILDING AND RESTORATION, MARINE AND MARITIME HERITAGE BY: A) BUILDING A REPLICA OF THE LENOX, A RESTORATION WARSHIP, AT CONVOYS WHARF IN DEPTFORD AND REPAIRING AND BUILDING OTHER CULTURALLY OR HISTORICALLY SIGNIFICANT VESSELS IN THE FUTURE; B) INCREASING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF THE HISTORY OF DEPTFORD, THE ROYAL DOCKYARD, AND THE AREA'S CONTRIBUTION TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF SHIPBUILDING; C) PROMOTING EDUCATIONAL, TEACHING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES THROUGH A MARITIME AND MANUFACTURING SKILLS AND TRAINING PROGRAMME, AND RELATED APPRENTICESHIP PROGRAMS; D) ESTABLISHING A CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE FOR HISTORIC SHIPBUILDING AND RESTORATION IN DEPTFORD; AND E) LAUNCHING AND SAILING THE LENOX TO SUPPORT A FUTURE PROGRAMME OF SAIL TRAINING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window