SOCIETI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Societi was established to raise awareness of Kawasaki Disease ? a disease which affects hundreds of children in the UK each year. Societi is an influencing and policy shaping organisation which works to drive change in awareness across the UK, about Kawasaki Disease. We want to enable urgently needed research and pursue changing policy and clinical practice for Kawasaki Disease across the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
350 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
R TULLOH | Chair | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Greenwood | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael William Danson | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Brogan | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Greenwood | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.62k | £34.87k | £195.44k | £102.16k | £141.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.15k | £43.58k | £116.98k | £125.25k | £156.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE CAUSES, DETECTION AND TREATMENT OF KAWASAKI DISEASE, BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (2) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS, CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF KAWASAKI DISEASE BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VICTORIA COURT
HOLME LANE
WINTHORPE
NEWARK
NG24 2NU
- Phone:
- 01636707343
- Email:
- claire@societi.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window