THE MID ESSEX BUDDHIST CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spiritual activities - regarded as religious in nature; they include the teaching and practice of Buddhism. All are welcome to any teaching or practice session. A number of one-day and weekend events are also held.. Secular activities - consist of courses on Mindfulness and ancillary activities, such as art classes and complementary treatments which are compatible with Buddhist ethics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 27 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Nelson Murray | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
KATRINA KUZMINAS | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY CARL WOLSTENHOLME | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL WARD | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
DIANE LINDA CARTER | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|||||
LYNDA rose | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Rey | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE TRUSS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/04/2020 | 02/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.24k | £75.98k | £144.88k | £132.95k | £47.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.93k | £15.46k | £15.38k | £20.98k | £65.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2021 | 07 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2021 | 07 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. ENCOURAGING MEMBERS AND OTHERS TO LIVE ETHICAL LIVES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE BUDDHA. 2. SUPPORTING ORDAINED MEMBERS OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY AND OTHER DULY ORDAINED BUDDHISTS, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COUNCIL OF THE CIO. 3. MAINTAINING CLOSE COMMUNICATION WITH AND WORKING UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST ORDER AND IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER GROUPS WITH THE SAME OBJECTS. 4. USING APPLICATIONS OF THE BUDDHA’S TEACHING TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF ALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mid Essex Buddhist Centre
70 Upper Chase
Chelmsford
CM2 0BN
- Phone:
- 07936 534546
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window