GOL DE LETRA UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brazil
- France
Governance
- 19 June 2017: Standard registration
- 09 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
1.1 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, HELP AND ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN SOCIALLY VULNERABLE COMMUNITIES IN BRAZIL THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: 1.1.1 RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 1.1.2 SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 1.1.3 ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; 1.2 TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT CHARITIES AND NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATION IN BRAZIL WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS FROM SOCIALLY VULNERABLE COMMUNITIES IN BRAZIL BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SPECIFIC PROGRAMMES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window