DYS SPACE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1173430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

space* is a bold, learning organisation which unlocks the potential of young people and their communities to provide a wide range of targeted, needs led, professional youth services across the whole of Devon.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 June 2017: Standard registration
  • 07 April 2021: Funds received from 1104199 X-PLORE YOUTH GROUP
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SPACE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Winsor Trustee 11 June 2024
None on record
Andrew Otty Trustee 26 March 2024
None on record
Daniel Barton Trustee 22 November 2023
None on record
Peter Adey Trustee 11 October 2023
None on record
Lara Rippon Trustee 25 July 2023
None on record
Oliver Lovell Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Cecilia Kokubu Trustee 22 February 2023
None on record
Katy Few-Singh Trustee 16 February 2021
None on record
JOHN HARRISON Trustee 11 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.54m £3.08m £4.07m £3.06m £3.07m
Total expenditure £2.79m £2.85m £3.71m £4.10m £3.78m
Income from government contracts £1.73m £1.82m £1.82m £1.87m £2.60m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.45k £45.32k £119.92k £8.98k £3.53k
Income - Other trading activities £81.79k £35.40k £504.61k £510.96k £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.45m £2.78m £3.44m £2.54m £2.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.04k £272 £340 £2.53k £8.46k
Income - Other £0 £219.70k £0 £0 £501.68k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.78m £2.85m £3.70m £4.09m £3.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £9.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £11.30k £6.92k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £8.23k £1.97k £9.89k £11.75k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £15.31k £27.91k £18.67k £23.48k £13.39k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.12m £1.51m £2.36m £1.75m £1.06m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.71m -£3.33m -£2.99m -£144.00k £252.00k
Total liabilities £680.51k £698.30k £852.94k £1.01m £1.01m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
100 CLUB
WEAR BARTON ROAD
EXETER
EX2 7EH
Phone:
01392662112