GLOBAL COMFORT(GC)LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Company's objectsd arew to promote the good physical and mental health of girls and women who have undergone or are at risk of female genital mutilation(FGM) or other harmful traditional practices. Toadvance the education of the public about the physical and emotional effects of FGM and other harmful traditional practices in order to promote the elimination all over the world
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
- Nigeria
- Sierra Leone
- The Gambia
Governance
- 18 May 2017: Standard registration
- GLOBAL COMFORT (Previous name)
- GLOBAL COMFORT (GC) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Comfort Momoh | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
STELLA OGUNNIYI | Trustee | 02 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAYI GNAFAM | Trustee | 02 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MOMOH | Trustee | 19 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150 | £230 | £1.37k | £395 | £195 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.21k | £216 | £1.01k | £631 | £355 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 May 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 October 2024 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF GIRLS AND WOMEN WHO HAVE UNDERGONE OR AT RISK OF FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION (FGM) OR OTHER HARMFUL TRADITIONAL PRACTICE 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL EFFECTS OF FGM AND OTHER HARMFUL TRADITIONAL PRACTICES IN ORDER TO PROMOTE THE ELIMINATION OF THE PRACTICE ALL OVER THE WORLD.IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO PROFESSIONALS AND ORGANISATIONS WORKING WITH COMMUNITIES THAT PRACTICE FGM AND OTHER HARMFUL TRADITIONAL PRACTICES TO ENSURE THEY ARE WELL TRAINED, SUPPORTED AND EQUIPPED TO SUPPORT, TREAT VICTIMS AND PROTECT THOSE AT RISK OF HARM
Contact information
- Address:
-
10A RUSSELL GARDENS
LONDON
N20 0TR
- Phone:
- 07801596500
- Email:
- drcomfortmomoh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window