BHS TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the relief of financial hardship amongst former employees of Bhs Ltd, their dependants and retired employees of the company.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 February 2017: CIO registration
- 18 August 2017: Funds received from 276828 BHS LTD EMPLOYEES TRUST FUND
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Martyn Jones | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Joan Curchin | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Amanda Taylor | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Edgar | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Eller | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Robinson Gibson | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES JOHN CRUDGE | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE TOPPING | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.38k | £69.01k | £73.49k | £64.64k | £72.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.58k | £225.42k | £254.29k | £364.63k | £368.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PERSONS WHO WERE IN THE EMPLOY OF BHS AT ANY TIME BEFORE AND/OR ON THE 31ST AUGUST 2016 AND THEIR DEPENDENTS BY: • MAKING GRANTS AND LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS; AND • PROVIDING OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY SHORT BREAKS AND ADVOCACY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Knoll Place
Walmer
DEAL
Kent
CT14 7LX
- Phone:
- 07495723550
- Email:
- bhstrustfund2@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window