MOTUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MOTUS is an organisation which aims to engage the people of the city of Milton Keynes in all forms of dance either as part of an audience or by taking part in our workshops and performances. The aim is to celebrate and promote dance and artistic expression and to encourage this art form to be embraced by the masses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £91,877 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 June 2017: CIO registration
- MËTUS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Davies | Chair | 06 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Michelle Clare Lockwood | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kopal Matanhelia | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Bradley-Goodship | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karthick Muruganantham | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Ingram | Trustee | 20 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Edward Turner | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Eleanor Harrison | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.16k | £94.52k | £116.80k | £67.88k | £116.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.27k | £47.54k | £136.89k | £79.19k | £96.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £86.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £90.95k | £77.44k | £25.73k | £91.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE ART OF DANCE IN ITS MANY FORMS BY FOSTERING AND PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF DANCE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT INCLUDING; (I) THE PROVISION OF PERFORMANCES, WORKSHOPS, CLASSES AND SEMINARS; AND (II) OFFERING INCLUSIVE AND ACCESSIBLE EVENTS IN AND AROUND MILTON KEYNES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MJ Emery & Co Ltd
22 St. John Street
NEWPORT PAGNELL
Buckinghamshire
MK16 8HJ
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- info@motusdance.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window