Financial history STEPS CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity number: 1171496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £50.11k £105.42k £50.86k £57.50k £111.48k
Total expenditure £72.42k £52.87k £62.81k £65.83k £98.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.89k £31.10k £6.89k £7.29k £4.75k