Financial history THE MUSTARD SEED EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1174103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.65k £14.21k £10.19k £15.74k £23.33k
Total expenditure £24.77k £10.83k £9.27k £10.32k £18.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A