Financial history AXIS SUPPORTED LIVING

Charity number: 1171529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £939.67k £962.24k £951.14k £933.12k £1.04m
Total expenditure £815.44k £890.53k £947.19k £987.19k £1.07m
Income from government contracts £451.52k £450.34k £437.64k £413.60k £1.03m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £939.67k £962.21k £950.86k £932.61k £1.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £29 £281 £515 £3.94k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £815.44k £890.53k £947.19k £987.19k £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.31k £3.60k £5.34k £5.87k £5.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0