VILLAGE RESTORATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mobilising funds to support Charities in Ghana.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Ghana
Governance
- 22 February 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR Geoffrey Kwakye-Donkor | Chair | 11 August 2016 |
|
|||||
AKOSAH SARPONG YIADOM | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
THERESA OPOKU APORI | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR KATHLEEN KWAKYE-DONKOR | Trustee | 11 August 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300 | £255 | £300 | £500 | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £255 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS AND SERVICES OF ANY KIND TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS IN GHANA: TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH IN GHANA IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN GHANA IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office No.1A City View Offices
99 Long Street
Manchester
M24 6UN
- Phone:
- 07502307060
- Email:
- info.roknod@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window