THE MUSEUM OF MILITARY MEDICINE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Inform and encourage the engagement of the public and armed forces personnel, including members of the Army Medical Services (AMS), in the role of the AMS in pioneering medical developments and innovations, in particular those that have subsequently been adopted into civilian healthcare practice, to the benefit of the health and wellbeing of the British public at large and humankind in general.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 January 2017: CIO registration
- 05 July 2019: Funds received from 1077705 THE MUSEUM OF MILITARY MEDICINE TRUST
- ARMY MEDICAL SERCVICES MUSEUM (Working name)
- MUSEUM OF MILITARY MEDICINE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alan Hawley | Chair | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Helen Susan Winder | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Debra Lynne Cannon | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colonel ASHLEIGH CHRISTIAN BOREHAM | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Nickson B.A., FCA | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR MARIE JEAN TERESA ELLIS | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
PROF MARK HARRISON | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.29k | £255.68k | £204.47k | £235.67k | £248.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £508.93k | £363.20k | £317.78k | £287.27k | £229.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jan 2017 as amended on 27 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
The Objects of the CIO shall be to: (a) Inform and encourage the engagement of the public and armed forces personnel, including members of the Army Medical Services (AMS), (i) in the role of the AMS in pioneering medical developments and innovations, in particular those that have subsequently been adopted into civilian healthcare practice, to the benefit of the health and wellbeing of the British public at large and humankind in general; (ii) explaining how the AMS provides immediate help and subsequent care for sick and wounded military personnel in both peace and war; (iii) In the advancement of research and care to wider populations at risk who are cared for by the AMS when employed on humanitarian operations; (iv) explaining how the AMS provides support both nationally and internationally in support of health and wellbeing, natural disaster relief and epidemic control (b) Promote and celebrate the heritage of the AMS and dedication of its personnel in serving the sick and wounded (both human and animals) by public exhibition and multi-media display of its artefact collections or archives in a museum or museums or other such public spaces and by the dissemination by any media of information concerning its past and future activities including (but without limitation) those described in paragraph (a) above, as the trustees may from time to time decide. (c) Promote teaching and learning about past developments, current technologies and future innovations in Military Medicine in all aspects through shared experience, world-class research, exhibitions, and through programming and demonstrations for the sustainment of the health and wellbeing for all that come under our care. (d) Sharing the expertise of the AMS in emergency and disaster medicine by supporting, promoting and collaborating in the advancement of education and research into emergency and disaster medicine and other medical and related topics by such arrangements as the trustees think fit with hospitals, universities, scientific institutions and cognate bodies concerned with the health and well-being of the general public.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MUSEUM OF MILITARY MEDICINE
KEOGH BARRACKS
ASH VALE
ALDERSHOT
GU12 5RQ
- Phone:
- 01252523176
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window