Financial history SOLIDARITÉS INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 1174883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/12/2021 30/12/2022 30/12/2023
Total gross income £122.01k £250.84k £118.75k £231.75k £207.19k
Total expenditure £122.01k £143.41k £120.85k £335.92k £207.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A