Governing document ROSHNI
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 AUGUST 1979 AS AMENDED 12 SEPTEMBER 1991, 6 APRIL 1995 AND 22 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN THE COMMUNITY, AND IN PARTICULAR WOMEN WHO ARE VULNERABLE DUE TO LANGUAGE AND ISOLATION, TO ENABLE THEM TO UTILISE A MAXIMUM RANGE OF OPTIONS AND ACHIEVE THE ABILITY TO DEFINE AND MEET THEIR NEEDS THEMSELVES, BOTH WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE AND QUALITY OF LIFE IN SOCIETY. IN PURSUANCE OF THIS OBJECT, ROSHNI WILL UNDERTAKE ANY TASKS WHICH ARE RELEVANT AND THESE MAY INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING: - PROVISION OF EMERGENCY ACCOMMODATION FOR WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN WITH OUR MAIN FOCUS ON WOMEN FROM THE SOUTH ASIAN COMMUNITY (INCLUDING INDIA, PAKISTAN, BANGLADESH, SRI LANKA, AFGHANISTAN, BURMA, BHUTAN, IRAN, MALDIVES, MYANMAR, MAURITIUS, NEPAL AND TIBET) AND GIRLS (OF 16 YEARS AND OVER). - PROVISION OF A COUNSELLING AND FAMILY ADVICE SERVICE. - EDUCATION AND WELFARE SERVICES. - HEALTHCARE. - PARTICIPATION IN PROJECTS FOR WOMEN.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AND THE WEST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.