Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF HAGLEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 509369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.12k £2.29k £9.46k £9.78k £5.23k
Total expenditure £5.00k £3.01k £6.08k £8.68k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A