THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, CHEYLESMORE, COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
? Regular public worship open to all. ? Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. ? Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses, small groups, and assemblies in schools. ? Provision of activities for youth, senior citizens, parents and toddlers with Christian ethos. ? Supporting other charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 18 April 2017: Standard registration
- PCC OF CHRIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ARTHUR CHEUMIN WOO | Chair | 17 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Robert Carl John Powell | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Parker | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ikechukwu Apakama | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Joyce Price | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anthony Michael Price | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
LAURA NICHOLSON | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.78k | £142.73k | £122.47k | £187.55k | £122.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.92k | £99.70k | £108.08k | £202.53k | £184.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Frankpledge Road
Coventry
CV3 5GT
- Phone:
- 02476502770
- Email:
- admin@christchurchcov.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window