TRIDENT YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable services in Taunton Deane
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 14 March 2017: CIO registration
- 11 January 2020: Funds received from 304653 TRIDENT YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE ALLAN CRAWLEY | Chair | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Ann Marcella Elliston | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Una Ann Lee | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Pattemore | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judy Cockings | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANN LOUISE PORTER | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM PRICE | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.33k | £48.46k | £46.46k | £45.24k | £49.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.69k | £39.12k | £38.48k | £51.81k | £39.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.47k | £11.85k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 May 2024 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 May 2024 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF CHILDREN AND PERSONS, IN THE BOROUGH OF TAUNTON DEANE
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRIDENT YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
GALMINGTON ROAD
TAUNTON
SOMERSET
- Phone:
- 01823330668
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window