BEACH ACCESS NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides all year round, free hire of beach wheelchairs at Tynemouth Longsands, Cullercoats, Whitley Bay, Blyth South Beach, Newbiggin-by-the-Sea, Bamburgh, Beadnell and South Shields.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE SUSAN NORAH CORFIELD | Chair | 17 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Turnbull | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alistair McDonald | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Wood | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Crawshaw | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HARVEY DIVERS | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|||||
SUSAN ROWLEY | Trustee | 17 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.25k | £36.85k | £47.41k | £23.14k | £44.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.48k | £36.72k | £43.38k | £31.50k | £23.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £400 | £6.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Apr 2017 as amended on 26 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, OR DISABILITY WHO ARE RESTRICTED IN THEIR ABILITY TO PARTICIPATE IN AND TAKE ADVANTAGE OF LOCAL BEACHES AND BEAUTY SPOTS IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND BY PROVIDING SPECIALLY ADAPTED WHEELCHAIRS AND OTHER MOBILITY AIDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 CHEVIOT VIEW
SEGHILL
CRAMLINGTON
NE23 7SS
- Phone:
- 03009994444
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window