SAMARITANS CHELTENHAM AND DISTRICT

Charity Number: 1170900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support people in Cheltenham, and elsewhere, who are experiencing feelings of distress or despair, including those who may be at risk of suicide, in order to improve their emotional health and to reduce the incidence of suicide. To promote better understanding in society of suicidal behaviour and the value of expressing feelings which may otherwise lead to suicide or impaired emotional health.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £88,034
Total expenditure: £74,969

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 February 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Goddard Chair 31 March 2023
None on record
John David Clarke Trustee 21 September 2024
None on record
Anthony Millard Trustee 24 April 2023
ROEDEAN SCHOOL
Received: On time
Sally Ryder-Taylor Trustee 24 September 2022
None on record
Toni Lisa Hardie Trustee 24 September 2022
None on record
Stephen lalic Trustee 24 September 2022
None on record
Andrew Evans Trustee 24 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £87.81k £88.34k £87.57k £138.35k £88.03k
Total expenditure £48.61k £86.94k £100.99k £62.96k £74.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 13 JAN 2003 AS AMENDED ON 22 JAN 2004 AS AMENDED ON 25 JAN 2007 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN CHELTENHAM AND DISTRICT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Area of benefit
CHELTENHAM AND DISTRICT.
Registration history
  • 21 February 1966 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE SAMARITANS
VICTORIA HOUSE
BACK OF ALBERT PLACE
CHELTENHAM
GL52 2HN
Phone:
01242370905