RESOURCE UGANDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Resource Uganda provides grants to partner organisations in Uganda, building up leaders in the local church to transform their communities. The organisation is based on the belief that the local church has the power to change the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Uganda
Governance
- 05 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Elizabeth Hogan | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Matthew Toller Philpot | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN PETER GORDON | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL JAMES HOYLE | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.69k | £7.62k | £8.27k | £7.48k | £10.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.02k | £7.56k | £8.34k | £8.88k | £9.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN UGANDA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH PROVIDING GRANTS TO LOCAL NGOS, PRINCIPALLY MINISTRY RESOURCING INTERNATIONAL, ENABLING THE ORGANISATIONS TO PROVIDE CHRISTIAN BIBLES AND RESOURCES TO LOCAL CHURCHES, PROVIDE TRAINING ON LEADERSHIP AND GOVERNANCE TO CHURCHES, AND SETTING UP MUTUALLY REINFORCING PARTNERSHIPS WITH THESE CHURCHES. 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG WOMEN, MEN AND CHILDREN IN UGANDA THROUGH PROVIDING GRANTS TO LOCAL NGOS, PRINCIPALLY MINISTRY RESOURCING INTERNATIONAL, ENABLING THE ORGANISATIONS TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO COMBAT INEQUALITY AND ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Easby Close
BISHOP AUCKLAND
County Durham
DL14 0RX
- Phone:
- 07588 531427
- Email:
- info@resourceuganda.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window