Trustees SAMARITANS OF BRACKNELL, WOKINGHAM, ASCOT AND DISTRICTS
Charity number: 1170901

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Songer | Chair | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John David williams | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Monk | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cathrine Deborah Wratten | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
James David Reid | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.