SAMARITANS OF SCARBOROUGH

Charity number: 1171040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity provides confidential emotional support to those who are experiencing feelings of distress or despair, including those who may be at risk of suicide, with the aim of improving their emotional health and reducing the incidence of suicide. The Charity operates a telephone helpline which is open 24 hours a day; 365 days a year. Our support allows contacts to explore difficult feelings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £33,510
Total expenditure: £40,650

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 May 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gill Nicol Chair 04 March 2024
None on record
Richard Shore Trustee 26 March 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Lorton-Gilbert Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.81k £62.52k £21.68k £40.40k £33.51k
Total expenditure £33.99k £34.68k £50.01k £46.91k £40.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £2.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 5 APRIL 1973 AS AMENDED 31 MAY 1994 AND 17 MAY 2006. AS AMENDED ON 28 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED ON 18 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN SCARBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH AND SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 10 May 1973 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
SAMARITANS OF SCARBOROUGH
SAMARITAN HOUSE
40 TRAFALGAR STREET WEST
SCARBOROUGH
YO12 7AS
Phone:
01723330367