Accounts and annual returns FAMILY RESTORATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1171177
Charity reporting is overdue by 1318 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 588 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 588 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 953 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 953 days
Annual return 30 November 2020 25 October 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1318 days
Annual return 30 November 2019 28 November 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 25 March 2021 176 days late Download Open in new window