Accounts and annual returns TAJ SULTAN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1171967
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 November 2024 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 November 2024 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 December 2023 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 December 2023 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 November 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 November 2021 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late Download Open in new window