PARADISE PLANTATIONS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIEVE POVERTY,SICKENESS AND ADVANCE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- Ghana
- India
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.04k | £9.50k | £7.27k | £21.66k | £24.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.00k | £13.37k | £18.27k | £19.37k | £22.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2023 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2023 | 173 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 April 2023 | 536 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 April 2023 | 536 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG ORPHANS, POOR PEOPLE, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, PROVIDING ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER, CLOTHING, WATER PUMPS AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES SUCH AS SCHOOLS FOR POOR PEOPLE AND ORPHANS; 3) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON HIM) AS INTERPRETED BY THE AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAAH SCHOOL OF THOUGHT.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window