Governing document LINCOLN MUSIC AND DRAMA FESTIVAL
Charity number: 509415

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MAY 1939 AMENDED 11 JUNE 1979 AND 27 JUNE 1984 AND 14 JUNE 2000 AND 17TH NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE GENERALLY, AND BY MEANS OF AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL IN PARTICULAR, THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE OF MUSIC, DANCING, ELOCUTION, LITERATURE AND ACTING IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE, NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.