THE MANCHESTER PERIOPERATIVE MEDICINE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the practice of perioperative medicine in Greater Manchester for the general good of the public and especially those going through surgery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 March 2017: CIO registration
- @PERIOPMAN (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Tina Louise Duff | Chair | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amarjeet Patil | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr DANIEL CONWAY | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/03/2020 | 02/03/2021 | 02/03/2022 | 02/03/2023 | 02/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.33k | £3.63k | £12.44k | £20.31k | £20.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.84k | £12.84k | £5.41k | £16.67k | £30.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: I. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH IN RELATION TO PERIOPERATIVE MEDICINE BY PROMOTING THE ADVANCEMENT OF PERIOPERATIVE PATIENT CARE AND SAFETY. II. THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THOSE BRANCHES OF MEDICAL SCIENCE CONCERNED WITH PERIOPERATIVE CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEPARTMENT OF ANAESTHESIA
MANCHESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY
OXFORD ROAD
MANCHESTER
M13 9WL
- Phone:
- 01612764551
- Email:
- info@periopman.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window