Financial history EALING CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity number: 1171556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £54.95k £55.06k £42.26k £10.95k £9.55k
Total expenditure £66.37k £48.17k £41.98k £34.78k £27.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A