Accounts and annual returns THE CORNER PLACE CHARITY

Charity number: 1174034
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 February 2019 On Time