THE OAKLEY WATERMAN CARAVAN FOUNDATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and to promote the preservation and protection of health by providing a respite holiday in a caravan(s) for children who are suffering from a critical or terminal illness and their families or carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
- West Sussex
Governance
- 23 February 2017: Standard registration
- 22 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.46k | £37.88k | £4.57k | £16.93k | £6.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.08k | £49.45k | £41.94k | £46.00k | £47.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 June 2024 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY PROVIDING A RESPITE HOLIDAY IN A CARAVAN(S) FOR CHILDREN WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM A CRITICAL OR TERMINAL ILLNESS AND THEIR FAMILIES OR CARERS. THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION IN AN APARTMENT(S) CLOSE TO SOUTHAMPTON GENERAL HOSPITAL FOR CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES OR CARERS WHO ARE UNDERGOING TREATMENT FOR A CRITICAL OR TERMINAL ILLNESS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window