PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF WINSCOMBE AND SANDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* Regular Public worship open to all * Private space for prayer and contemplation * Pastoral Work - visiting the sick and bereaved * Providing activities with a Christian Ethos for families and their children * Assemblies lead in local schools * Promoting christianity by providing activities for all age groups * Support for other Charities in the UK and oversees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Somerset
Governance
- 18 May 2017: Standard registration
- PCC OF WINSCOMBE AND SANDFORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew James Hiscox | Chair | 30 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Joyce Cutmore | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Hagen | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Campbell Haynes | Trustee | 15 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Christine Morris | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Joan Williams | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Gunn | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derrick Claridge | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Alice Welling | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS WALTER OGRAM | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Carol Claridge | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY ELIZABETH BALDWIN | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.96k | £97.47k | £139.93k | £99.11k | £98.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.20k | £90.44k | £90.09k | £87.62k | £110.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2023 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2023 | 240 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 WOODBOROUGH ROAD
WINSCOMBE
BS25 1BA
- Phone:
- 01934844650
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window