Accounts and annual returns VESSELS OF HONOUR MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1170971
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 December 2023 19 October 2024 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2022 16 October 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2021 24 October 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2020 18 November 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2019 15 December 2020 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2019 Not Required