VESSELS OF HONOUR MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide regular weekly recreational and cultural activities to youth, adult recreational and cultural programs, and health education and services to children and adults. 2. To increase the proficiency of adults in Croydon to achieve by making available English as a Second Language (ESOL), and life skills classes.3. To provide a low cost food program (and an emergency food program for those
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Angola
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Ghana
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 04 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DERBIE NOKA | Chair | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
TSHONDO ETAMBA | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
OLGA MASSAMBA | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2019 | 01/12/2020 | 01/12/2021 | 01/12/2022 | 01/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.50k | £11.60k | £17.50k | £24.58k | £15.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.00k | £10.90k | £16.85k | £22.15k | £15.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2019 | 15 December 2020 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF; 2. THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING THROUGHOUT LONDON EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 WINDSOR ROAD
THORNTON HEATH
CR7 8HF
- Phone:
- 07949195227
- Email:
- hvministries@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window