THE SAFFI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ASIA The advancement of Education in Asia within disadvantaged and underprivileged schools, by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education and welfare of pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 27 March 2017: CIO registration
- THE JIG CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE ROBERT STAPLES CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Staples | Chair | 05 January 2017 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN ELIZABETH MUSSON | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE FLITCROFT | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH PAULA HAWKER | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA JOHNSON | Trustee | 05 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY DENT | Trustee | 05 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.82k | £180.00k | £235.48k | £411.01k | £200.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.04k | £213.31k | £219.27k | £309.49k | £266.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 27 MAR 2017 AMENDED ON 10 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ASIA BY SUCH MEANS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: *PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND THE WELFARE OF PUPILS *PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 INCLUDING THE AWARD TO SUCH PERSONS OF SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS AT ANY ESTABLISHMENT OF EDUCATION *PREPARING PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT *ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY IN ASIA WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH EDUCATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ASIA BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 MAIN STREET
NORTH RAUCEBY
SLEAFORD
NG34 8QP
- Phone:
- 01400262196
- Email:
- saffisandra@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window