MILAAP MULTICULTURAL DAY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Day Care services for the Older People from the MultiCultural Communities within the Royal Borough of Kingston Upon Thames, Surrey ~ and from Neighbouring Boroughs ~ particularly the provision of meals, social activities, and recreation for their health and wellbeing ~ as well as support and advocacy services for our Members, and on their behalf to their Carers (Family, Relatives, Etc).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £38,400 from 1 government contract(s) and £6,730 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Merton
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 02 February 2017: CIO registration
- 24 July 2019: Funds received from 1023015 MILAAP MULTICULTURAL DAY CENTRE
- MILAAP (Working name)
- MILAAP CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prabha SHETTY MSc | Chair | 18 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Neena Chokshi | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nimisha Patel | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veena Chappia | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sita Malhotra | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shobhna Gandhi | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daksha Dodia | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Manjula Bodalia | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lalita Ahmed | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
YASHODHARA PATEL | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
PUSHPA PATEL | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHANDRAVALI SHAH | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.84k | £92.34k | £75.06k | £84.13k | £98.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.29k | £65.02k | £70.90k | £75.59k | £79.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £38.32k | £38.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.92k | £39.27k | £38.31k | £9.30k | £6.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PERSONS (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ELDERLY PERSONS OF ETHNIC MINORITY ORIGIN) IN NEED WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF A MEALS SERVICE. (2) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR ELDERLY PERSONS (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ELDERLY PERSONS OF ETHNIC MINORITY ORIGIN) WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS. (3) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY THROUGH WORKING IN A MULTI-CULTURAL SETTING TO INCREASE THE UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIFFERENT SOCIAL AND CULTURAL BACKGROUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
King's Oak Centre
Dickerage Lane
New Malden
Surrey
- Phone:
- 02085472887
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window